THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:25:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Transfusion Medicine & Tissue Bank
Room B 204
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-4042
Fax: (416) 480-6035

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 30 Nov 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
University Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yulia Lin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Nov 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Lin (CPSO#: 73986 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Clinical Pathology
Room B 204
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4042

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Transfusion Medicine & Tissue Bank
Room B 204
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-4042
Fax: (416) 480-6035

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 30 Nov 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
University Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yulia Lin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Nov 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Lin (CPSO#: 73986 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Clinical Pathology
Room B 204
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4042

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YULIA LIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YULIA LIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 May 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 May 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 May 2004

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 May 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999