THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:01:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: B1 Clinics
Providence Healthcare
3276 St Clair Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1L 1W1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 285-3619
Fax: (416) 285-3764
Address: Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
Rumsey Centre
345 Rumsey Road
Toronto Ontario M4G 1R7
Phone: (416) 597-3422
Extension: 5300
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 27 May 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 27 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
University Health Network Rumsey Centre Toronto
Providence Health Care Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Rumsey Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Providence Health Care Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Albert Cheng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cheng (CPSO#: 73994 )
Business Address: 3276 St Clair Ave E
Scarborough ON M1L 1W1

Corporation Name: Albert Cheng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Jun 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: B1 Clinics
Providence Healthcare
3276 St Clair Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1L 1W1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 285-3619
Fax: (416) 285-3764
Address: Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
Rumsey Centre
345 Rumsey Road
Toronto Ontario M4G 1R7
Phone: (416) 597-3422
Extension: 5300
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 27 May 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 27 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
University Health Network Rumsey Centre Toronto
Providence Health Care Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Rumsey Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Providence Health Care Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Albert Cheng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cheng (CPSO#: 73994 )
Business Address: 3276 St Clair Ave E
Scarborough ON M1L 1W1

Corporation Name: Albert Cheng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Jun 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALBERT SAU-SHAN CHENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHENG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALBERT SAU-SHAN CHENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHENG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999