THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:11:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Medical Centre
707 Charlotte Street
P O Box 4200
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 876-4559
Fax: 705-743-1449

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gabriel G. Fuoco Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Fuoco (CPSO#: 74016 )
Business Address: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 743-2121
Business Address: The Medical Centre
707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7B3
(705) 876-4559

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Medical Centre
707 Charlotte Street
P O Box 4200
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 876-4559
Fax: 705-743-1449

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gabriel G. Fuoco Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Fuoco (CPSO#: 74016 )
Business Address: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 743-2121
Business Address: The Medical Centre
707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7B3
(705) 876-4559

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GABRIEL GIANNI CARLO FUOCO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FUOCO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GABRIEL GIANNI CARLO FUOCO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FUOCO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jul 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999