THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:28:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1405 Edward Street
Hearst Ontario P0L 1N0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705 362-4291
Fax: 705 372-2937

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 08 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst) Hearst
HOSPITAL: Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst)
LOCATION: Hearst

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Yanivker & M. Bertucci Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bertucci (CPSO#: 74019 ) Dr. S. Yanivker (CPSO#: 75194 )
Business Address: Hamilton General Hospital
Hamilton Health Sciences
Department of Critical Care Medicine
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 527-4322 Extn: 44697
Business Address: Notre Dame Hospital
1405 Edward Street
Hearst Ontario P0L 1N0
(705) 362-4291

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1405 Edward Street
Hearst Ontario P0L 1N0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705 362-4291
Fax: 705 372-2937

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 08 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst) Hearst
HOSPITAL: Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst)
LOCATION: Hearst

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Yanivker & M. Bertucci Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bertucci (CPSO#: 74019 ) Dr. S. Yanivker (CPSO#: 75194 )
Business Address: Hamilton General Hospital
Hamilton Health Sciences
Department of Critical Care Medicine
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 527-4322 Extn: 44697
Business Address: Notre Dame Hospital
1405 Edward Street
Hearst Ontario P0L 1N0
(705) 362-4291

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARCO ANTONIO BERTUCCI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERTUCCI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARCO ANTONIO BERTUCCI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERTUCCI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 May 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 May 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999