THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:46:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 34 Pearl St
Mississauga Ontario L5M 1X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 729-4447
Fax: 905-542-3107
Address: 407 Huron St
Hong Fook Mental Health Association
3rd Floor
Toronto ON M5S 2G5
Phone: 416-493-4242
Fax: 416-595-6332

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian Cho Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Nov 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Cho (CPSO#: 74034 )
Business Address: 34 Pearl Street
Mississauga Ontario L5M 1X2
(647) 729-4447
Business Address: 130 Dundas Street West
3rd Floor
Toronto Ontario M7A 2C7
(416) 493-4242

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 34 Pearl St
Mississauga Ontario L5M 1X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 729-4447
Fax: 905-542-3107
Address: 407 Huron St
Hong Fook Mental Health Association
3rd Floor
Toronto ON M5S 2G5
Phone: 416-493-4242
Fax: 416-595-6332

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian Cho Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Nov 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Cho (CPSO#: 74034 )
Business Address: 34 Pearl Street
Mississauga Ontario L5M 1X2
(647) 729-4447
Business Address: 130 Dundas Street West
3rd Floor
Toronto Ontario M7A 2C7
(416) 493-4242

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIAN CHO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIAN CHO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999