THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:59:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mitchell Family Doctors
P O Box 790
7 Frances Street
Mitchell Ontario N0K 1N0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 348-8402
Fax: (519) 348-8400
Address: Department of Emergency Medicine
Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford Ontario N5A 2Y6
Phone: (519) 272-8200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 26 Oct 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 26 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Seaforth Community Hospital Seaforth
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

HOSPITAL: Seaforth Community Hospital
LOCATION: Seaforth

HOSPITAL: St Mary's Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: St Marys

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Schieldrop Tsafnat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Mar 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Tsafnat (CPSO#: 73511 ) Dr. P. Schieldrop (CPSO#: 74042 )
Business Address: Mitchell Family Doctors
7 Francis Street
P.O. Box 790
Mitchell Ontario N0K 1N0
(519) 348-8402
Business Address: Department of Emergency Medicine
Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford Ontario N5A 2Y6
(519) 272-8200

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mitchell Family Doctors
P O Box 790
7 Frances Street
Mitchell Ontario N0K 1N0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 348-8402
Fax: (519) 348-8400
Address: Department of Emergency Medicine
Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford Ontario N5A 2Y6
Phone: (519) 272-8200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 26 Oct 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 26 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Seaforth Community Hospital Seaforth
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

HOSPITAL: Seaforth Community Hospital
LOCATION: Seaforth

HOSPITAL: St Mary's Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: St Marys

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Schieldrop Tsafnat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Mar 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Tsafnat (CPSO#: 73511 ) Dr. P. Schieldrop (CPSO#: 74042 )
Business Address: Mitchell Family Doctors
7 Francis Street
P.O. Box 790
Mitchell Ontario N0K 1N0
(519) 348-8402
Business Address: Department of Emergency Medicine
Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford Ontario N5A 2Y6
(519) 272-8200

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PHILIP JOHN SCHIELDROP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHIELDROP is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PHILIP JOHN SCHIELDROP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHIELDROP is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999