THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 13:34:49 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Otago, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Critical Care Medicine Program
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-4919
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher Parshuram Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jul 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Parshuram (CPSO#: 74049 )
Business Address: The Hospital for Sick Children
Critical Care Medicine Program
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
(416) 813-4919

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Otago, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Critical Care Medicine Program
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-4919
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher Parshuram Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jul 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Parshuram (CPSO#: 74049 )
Business Address: The Hospital for Sick Children
Critical Care Medicine Program
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
(416) 813-4919

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
13 Aug 2009
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 13 2009
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Christopher Sushil Parshuram may practise medicine only,

(i) in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the
Department of Paediatrics, University of Toronto, in which Dr.
Parshuram holds a geographical full-time teaching or research
appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of
his appointment.

2. The certificate will automatically expire when Dr. Parshuram no longer
holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Christopher Sushil Parshuram may practise medicine only,

(i) in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the
Department of Paediatrics, University of Toronto, in which Dr.
Parshuram holds a geographical full-time teaching or research
appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of
his appointment.

2. The certificate will automatically expire when Dr. Parshuram no longer
holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Otago, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 13 Aug 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 13 Aug 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 Mar 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 23 Jun 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 2009

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 2009

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 Mar 2009

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2008

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2001

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2001
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999