THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:30:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michael's Hospital
Corporate Health & Safety Services
30 Bond Street
2nd Floor Shuter Wing
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-5013
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Occupational Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Occupational Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R.Y. Qureshi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Qureshi (CPSO#: 74095 )
Business Address: 30 Bond St
CHSS
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
(416) 864-5013

Corporation Name: Dr. R.Y. Qureshi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Nov 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michael's Hospital
Corporate Health & Safety Services
30 Bond Street
2nd Floor Shuter Wing
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-5013
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Occupational Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Occupational Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R.Y. Qureshi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Qureshi (CPSO#: 74095 )
Business Address: 30 Bond St
CHSS
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
(416) 864-5013

Corporation Name: Dr. R.Y. Qureshi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Nov 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROOHI YASMIN QURESHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QURESHI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROOHI YASMIN QURESHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QURESHI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 1999