THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:32:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 207-435 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON N2T 0C2
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 5197459889
Fax: 5197456446

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 09 Nov 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 18 Nov 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 09 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Houda Ergaiey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Ergaiey (CPSO#: 74124 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 207-435 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON N2T 0C2
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 5197459889
Fax: 5197456446

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 09 Nov 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 18 Nov 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 09 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Houda Ergaiey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Ergaiey (CPSO#: 74124 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HOUDA ALI ERGAIEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ERGAIEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HOUDA ALI ERGAIEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ERGAIEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 1999