THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:49:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bathurst Walk-In Clinic and
Family Practice
Suite 101
4430 Bathurst Street
Downsview Ontario M3H 3S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 633-3629
Fax: (416) 633-3624
Address: Peel Memorial Urgent Care Centre
20 Lynch St.
Brampton Ontario
L6W 2Z8
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
Phone: 905-494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Dr. E
Brampton Ontario
L6R 3J7
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: 905-494-2120
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Dec 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 10 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Atwal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jul 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Atwal (CPSO#: 74147 )
Business Address: Bathurst Walk In Clinic
and Family Practice
Suite 101
4430 Bathurst Street
Downsview Ontario M3H 3S3
(416) 633-3629
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Address: 20 Lynch Street
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bathurst Walk-In Clinic and
Family Practice
Suite 101
4430 Bathurst Street
Downsview Ontario M3H 3S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 633-3629
Fax: (416) 633-3624
Address: Peel Memorial Urgent Care Centre
20 Lynch St.
Brampton Ontario
L6W 2Z8
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
Phone: 905-494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Dr. E
Brampton Ontario
L6R 3J7
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: 905-494-2120
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Dec 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 10 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Atwal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jul 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Atwal (CPSO#: 74147 )
Business Address: Bathurst Walk In Clinic
and Family Practice
Suite 101
4430 Bathurst Street
Downsview Ontario M3H 3S3
(416) 633-3629
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Address: 20 Lynch Street
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KANWALDIP SINGH ATWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ATWAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KANWALDIP SINGH ATWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ATWAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1999
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 1999