THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:59:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Mysore, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MALAYALAM

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health Sciences North
Kirkwood Place
680 Kirkwood Drive
Sudbury Ontario P3E 1X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 675-5900
Extension: 8234
Fax: (705) 671-3031
Address: Sudbury Jail
181 Elm Street
Sudbury
Sudbury Ontario P3C 1T8
Phone: (705) 564-4150
Extension: 218
Fax: (705) 564-4343
Address: Nadmadwin Clinic
16 Complex Drive
Wikwemikong
Wikwemikong Ontario P0P 2J0
Phone: (705) 859-2330
Fax: (705) 859-2035

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 06 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anil Joseph Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Dec 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Joseph (CPSO#: 74155 )
Business Address: 680 Kirkwood Drive
Sudbury ON P3E 1X3
7055237100 Extn: 8234
Business Address: Sudbury Algoma Hospital
680 Kirkwood Avenue
Sudbury Ontario P3E 1X3
(705) 675-5900

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MALAYALAM
Medical School: University of Mysore, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health Sciences North
Kirkwood Place
680 Kirkwood Drive
Sudbury Ontario P3E 1X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 675-5900
Extension: 8234
Fax: (705) 671-3031
Address: Sudbury Jail
181 Elm Street
Sudbury
Sudbury Ontario P3C 1T8
Phone: (705) 564-4150
Extension: 218
Fax: (705) 564-4343
Address: Nadmadwin Clinic
16 Complex Drive
Wikwemikong
Wikwemikong Ontario P0P 2J0
Phone: (705) 859-2330
Fax: (705) 859-2035

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 06 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anil Joseph Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Dec 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Joseph (CPSO#: 74155 )
Business Address: 680 Kirkwood Drive
Sudbury ON P3E 1X3
7055237100 Extn: 8234
Business Address: Sudbury Algoma Hospital
680 Kirkwood Avenue
Sudbury Ontario P3E 1X3
(705) 675-5900

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANIL PAUL JOSEPH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOSEPH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANIL PAUL JOSEPH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOSEPH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Mysore, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 1999