THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:52:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1967
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PITT STREET MEDICAL CENTRE
1335 PITT STEET
Cornwall Ontario K6J 3T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 932 6163
Fax: (844) 946 0855
Address: 100-2 Gurdwara Rd
Provis Rudd clinic
Nepean ON K2E 1A2
Phone: 613-216-1823
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 27 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Glengarry Memorial Hospital Alexandria
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
HOSPITAL: Hopital Glengarry Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alexandria

HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W. Moussa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Moussa (CPSO#: 74183 )
Business Address: 1135 Pitt St
Cornwall Ontario K6J 5T3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PITT STREET MEDICAL CENTRE
1335 PITT STEET
Cornwall Ontario K6J 3T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 932 6163
Fax: (844) 946 0855
Address: 100-2 Gurdwara Rd
Provis Rudd clinic
Nepean ON K2E 1A2
Phone: 613-216-1823
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 27 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Glengarry Memorial Hospital Alexandria
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
HOSPITAL: Hopital Glengarry Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alexandria

HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W. Moussa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Moussa (CPSO#: 74183 )
Business Address: 1135 Pitt St
Cornwall Ontario K6J 5T3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WASSEEM MOUSSA ISKANDER MOUSSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOUSSA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WASSEEM MOUSSA ISKANDER MOUSSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOUSSA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1967

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1999
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jul 1999