THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:10:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Pune, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, MARATHI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ashgrove Medical Centre
Suite 307
6633 Highway 7 East
Markham Ontario L3P 7P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 471-2221
Fax: (905) 471-1070

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital Uxbridge
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital
LOCATION: Uxbridge

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hemant Shirali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Shirali (CPSO#: 74199 )
Business Address: 381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
(905) 472-7000
Business Address: Ashgrove Medical Centre
Suite 307
6633 Highway 7 East
Markham Ontario L3P 7P2
(905) 471-2221

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, MARATHI
Medical School: University of Pune, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ashgrove Medical Centre
Suite 307
6633 Highway 7 East
Markham Ontario L3P 7P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 471-2221
Fax: (905) 471-1070

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital Uxbridge
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital
LOCATION: Uxbridge

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hemant Shirali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Shirali (CPSO#: 74199 )
Business Address: 381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
(905) 472-7000
Business Address: Ashgrove Medical Centre
Suite 307
6633 Highway 7 East
Markham Ontario L3P 7P2
(905) 471-2221

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEMANT RAMESH SHIRALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHIRALI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEMANT RAMESH SHIRALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHIRALI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Pune, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 1999