THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:57:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Glenridge Walk-In Clinic
209 Glenridge #5
St. Catharines Ontario L2T 3J6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 362-5333
Fax: (289) 362-5335
Address: Walk In Clinic at Walmart
7418 Oakwood Drive
Niagara Falls, Ontario
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 6S5
Phone: (289) 477-6011
Fax: (289) 477-6022
Address: Morrison Walk In Clinic
6453 Morrison Street
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 7H1
Phone: (289) 296-1933
Fax: (905) 374-2966

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 02 Dec 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 02 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Colorado Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jan 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Colorado (CPSO#: 74233 )
Business Address: 7481 Oakwood Drive
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 6S5
(289) 477-6011
Business Address: 209 Glenridge Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2T 3J6
(289) 362-5335
Business Address: 6453 Morrison Street
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 7H1
(289) 296-1933

Corporation Name: Dalgleish Jayawardene & Luterman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Apr 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Glenridge Walk-In Clinic
209 Glenridge #5
St. Catharines Ontario L2T 3J6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 362-5333
Fax: (289) 362-5335
Address: Walk In Clinic at Walmart
7418 Oakwood Drive
Niagara Falls, Ontario
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 6S5
Phone: (289) 477-6011
Fax: (289) 477-6022
Address: Morrison Walk In Clinic
6453 Morrison Street
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 7H1
Phone: (289) 296-1933
Fax: (905) 374-2966

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 02 Dec 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 02 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Colorado Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jan 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Colorado (CPSO#: 74233 )
Business Address: 7481 Oakwood Drive
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 6S5
(289) 477-6011
Business Address: 209 Glenridge Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2T 3J6
(289) 362-5335
Business Address: 6453 Morrison Street
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 7H1
(289) 296-1933

Corporation Name: Dalgleish Jayawardene & Luterman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Apr 2018

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN ROBERT COLORADO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLORADO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN ROBERT COLORADO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLORADO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1999
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 1999