THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 06:23:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Nagpur University, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 105
15 Gallie Court
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 728-1962
Fax: (705) 728-9455

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Apr 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 01 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alliston

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Krishnan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Krishnan (CPSO#: 74248 ) Dr. M. Krishnan (CPSO#: 74370 )
Business Address: Suite 15
15 Gallie Court
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
Business Address: 1 Quarry Ridge Road
Suite 205
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
(705) 721-1962
Business Address: Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
(705) 728-1962

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: Nagpur University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 105
15 Gallie Court
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 728-1962
Fax: (705) 728-9455

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Apr 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 01 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alliston

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Krishnan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Krishnan (CPSO#: 74248 ) Dr. M. Krishnan (CPSO#: 74370 )
Business Address: Suite 15
15 Gallie Court
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
Business Address: 1 Quarry Ridge Road
Suite 205
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
(705) 721-1962
Business Address: Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
(705) 728-1962

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MURALI KRISHNAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRISHNAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MURALI KRISHNAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRISHNAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Nagpur University, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Mar 2008
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 27 Nov 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 Nov 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Jul 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Aug 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1999
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Mar 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Mar 2008

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 27 Nov 2006

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 Nov 2006

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2004
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2004

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jan 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2003

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Feb 2003
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Feb 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2001
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Aug 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Aug 1999