THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 09:35:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: South Muskoka Memorial Hospital
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge Ontario P1L 2E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 645-4400
Extension: 3121
Fax: (705) 645-1225

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Sep 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anthony Shearing and Helen Dempster Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shearing (CPSO#: 74281 ) Dr. H. Dempster (CPSO#: 77921 )
Business Address: Suite 202
348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H8
(705) 788-3623
Business Address: 2-39 Campus Trail
Huntsville ON P1H 0E5
705-788-3623

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: South Muskoka Memorial Hospital
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge Ontario P1L 2E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 645-4400
Extension: 3121
Fax: (705) 645-1225

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Sep 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anthony Shearing and Helen Dempster Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shearing (CPSO#: 74281 ) Dr. H. Dempster (CPSO#: 77921 )
Business Address: Suite 202
348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H8
(705) 788-3623
Business Address: 2-39 Campus Trail
Huntsville ON P1H 0E5
705-788-3623

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANTHONY DENNING SHEARING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEARING is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANTHONY DENNING SHEARING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEARING is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Sep 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Sep 1999