THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 10:40:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bridgepoint Family Health Team
2nd Floor
430 Broadview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 470-6690
Extension: 4
Fax: (416) 470-6691

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Aug 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 26 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Bridgepoint Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Karen L. Chu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Apr 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Chu (CPSO#: 74309 )
Business Address: Bridgepoint Family Health Team
430 Broadview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 2N1
(416) 470-6690

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bridgepoint Family Health Team
2nd Floor
430 Broadview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 470-6690
Extension: 4
Fax: (416) 470-6691

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Aug 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 26 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Bridgepoint Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Karen L. Chu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Apr 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Chu (CPSO#: 74309 )
Business Address: Bridgepoint Family Health Team
430 Broadview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 2N1
(416) 470-6690

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN LISA CHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN LISA CHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1999
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 1999