THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:53:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1973
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Division of Infectious Diseases
The Ottawa Hospital - General Div
501 Smyth Road
Room G-12
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Extension: 74184
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 01 Dec 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Rehabilitation Centre Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Rehabilitation Centre
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Barry Craig Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Lee (CPSO#: 74315 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Division of Infectious Diseases
The Ottawa Hospital - General Div
501 Smyth Road
Room G-12
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Extension: 74184
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 01 Dec 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Rehabilitation Centre Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Rehabilitation Centre
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Barry Craig Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Lee (CPSO#: 74315 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BARRY CRAIG LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BARRY CRAIG LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1973

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1999
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 1999