THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:53:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 460 Springbank Drive
Suite 305
London Ontario N6J 0A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5199633782
Fax: 5199630453

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jul 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 17 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. W. Cheng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Nov 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Cheng (CPSO#: 74361 )
Business Address: Tillsonburg Medical Centre
200 Broadway Street
Tillsonburg Ontario N4G 5A7
(519) 842-4231
Business Address: 460 Springbank Drive
Suite 305
London Ontario N6J 0A8
5199633782

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 460 Springbank Drive
Suite 305
London Ontario N6J 0A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5199633782
Fax: 5199630453

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jul 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 17 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. W. Cheng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Nov 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Cheng (CPSO#: 74361 )
Business Address: Tillsonburg Medical Centre
200 Broadway Street
Tillsonburg Ontario N4G 5A7
(519) 842-4231
Business Address: 460 Springbank Drive
Suite 305
London Ontario N6J 0A8
5199633782

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILLOON WAI MING CHENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHENG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILLOON WAI MING CHENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHENG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Nov 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Apr 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Nov 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 02 Nov 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jul 2002

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Nov 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 1999