THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:32:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Sinai Hospital
Ontario Power Generation Building
3rd Floor, Room 3-913
700 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Extension: 7732
Fax: (416) 586-8269

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 31 Dec 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Candice Silversides Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Silversides (CPSO#: 74403 )
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
Ontario Power Generation Building
700 University Avenue
Room 3913
Toronto Ontario M5G 1Z5
(416) 486-4800 Extn: 7732
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
Suite 5N-523
500 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
(416) 586-4800 Extn: 7732

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Sinai Hospital
Ontario Power Generation Building
3rd Floor, Room 3-913
700 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Extension: 7732
Fax: (416) 586-8269

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 31 Dec 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Candice Silversides Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Silversides (CPSO#: 74403 )
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
Ontario Power Generation Building
700 University Avenue
Room 3913
Toronto Ontario M5G 1Z5
(416) 486-4800 Extn: 7732
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
Suite 5N-523
500 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
(416) 586-4800 Extn: 7732

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CANDICE KRISTEEN SILVERSIDES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SILVERSIDES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CANDICE KRISTEEN SILVERSIDES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SILVERSIDES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 15 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Dec 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 1999
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Sep 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2003

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 2001

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 1999