THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:35:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: suite 228
230 Victoria St
London Ontario N6A 2C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 433-8834
Fax: (519) 433-8462

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: McLellan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Mar 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. K. McLellan (CPSO#: 74405 )
Business Address: 633 Colborne Street
2nd Floor
London Ontario N6B 2V3
(519) 433-8834
Business Address: 230 Victoria St
London ON N6A 2C2
519-433-8834

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: suite 228
230 Victoria St
London Ontario N6A 2C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 433-8834
Fax: (519) 433-8462

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: McLellan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Mar 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. K. McLellan (CPSO#: 74405 )
Business Address: 633 Colborne Street
2nd Floor
London Ontario N6B 2V3
(519) 433-8834
Business Address: 230 Victoria St
London ON N6A 2C2
519-433-8834

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KENNETH CLAUDE MCLELLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLELLAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KENNETH CLAUDE MCLELLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLELLAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Jan 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 1999
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Nov 1999