THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:59:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto General Hospital
1-PMB-287
585 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Fax: (416) 593-0502

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dheeraj Rajan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Rajan (CPSO#: 74438 )
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
1-PMB-287- 585 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
(416) 603-6276
Business Address: 542 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 603-6276

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Apr 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto General Hospital
1-PMB-287
585 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Fax: (416) 593-0502

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dheeraj Rajan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Rajan (CPSO#: 74438 )
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
1-PMB-287- 585 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
(416) 603-6276
Business Address: 542 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 603-6276

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Apr 2017

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DHEERAJ KUMAR RAJAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DHEERAJ KUMAR RAJAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 1999
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Dec 1999