THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:25:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: American University of Beirut, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 23546 Woodbine Avenue
Keswick Ontario L4P 0E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 989 0911
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 29 Apr 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 29 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W. Abou Reslan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Abou Reslan (CPSO#: 74450 )
Business Address: 2-23546 Woodbine Ave
Keswick ON L4P 0E2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: American University of Beirut, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 23546 Woodbine Avenue
Keswick Ontario L4P 0E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 989 0911
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 29 Apr 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 29 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W. Abou Reslan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Abou Reslan (CPSO#: 74450 )
Business Address: 2-23546 Woodbine Ave
Keswick ON L4P 0E2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WALID FADLALAH ABOU RESLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABOU RESLAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WALID FADLALAH ABOU RESLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABOU RESLAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: American University of Beirut, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Dec 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2000
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Nov 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Dec 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2000