THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:00:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 154 Wellington St E
Aurora ON L4G 1J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-726-9333
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Diane C. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wong (CPSO#: 74457 )
Business Address: 527 Laurelwood Gate
Newmarket Ontario L3X 2H3
416-230-0907
Business Address: 154 Wellington St E
Aurora ON L4G 1J3
905-726-9333

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 154 Wellington St E
Aurora ON L4G 1J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-726-9333
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Diane C. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wong (CPSO#: 74457 )
Business Address: 527 Laurelwood Gate
Newmarket Ontario L3X 2H3
416-230-0907
Business Address: 154 Wellington St E
Aurora ON L4G 1J3
905-726-9333

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DIANE CATHERINE WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DIANE CATHERINE WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Apr 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2001

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jan 2000