THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:59:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Mangalore University, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 382 Wellington Street West
Chatham Ontario N7M 1K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5193518200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 08 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: Chatham Public General Hospital Society
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kukkadi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jan 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Kukkadi (CPSO#: 74482 )
Business Address: Chatham Professional Building
857 Grand Avenue West
Suite 202
Chatham Ontario N7L 4T1
(519) 351-8202

Corporation Name: Dr. Kukkadi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Jan 2008

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Mangalore University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 382 Wellington Street West
Chatham Ontario N7M 1K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5193518200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 08 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: Chatham Public General Hospital Society
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kukkadi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jan 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Kukkadi (CPSO#: 74482 )
Business Address: Chatham Professional Building
857 Grand Avenue West
Suite 202
Chatham Ontario N7L 4T1
(519) 351-8202

Corporation Name: Dr. Kukkadi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Jan 2008

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZAHEER KUKKADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUKKADI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZAHEER KUKKADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUKKADI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Mangalore University, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 2000
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Sep 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jan 2000