THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:11:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Cambridge School of Clinical Medicine, 1989
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Limestone Dermatology
163 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 1S2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 549-6660
Fax: (613) 547-2079

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. M. MacSween Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Aug 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. R. MacSween (CPSO#: 74503 )
Business Address: 163 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 1S2
(613) 549-6660

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Cambridge School of Clinical Medicine, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Limestone Dermatology
163 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 1S2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 549-6660
Fax: (613) 547-2079

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. M. MacSween Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Aug 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. R. MacSween (CPSO#: 74503 )
Business Address: 163 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 1S2
(613) 549-6660

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUTH MARGARET MACSWEEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACSWEEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUTH MARGARET MACSWEEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACSWEEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Cambridge School of Clinical Medicine, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2000
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2000
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2000