THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:43:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Haldimand War Memorial Hospital
400 Broad Street W
Dunnville Ontario N1A 2P7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 774-7431
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville
HOSPITAL: Haldimand War Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Dunnville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffery Vilk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Aug 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Vilk (CPSO#: 74515 )
Business Address: Barclay Diagnostic Imaging
589 Lake Street
St Catharines Ontario L2N 7L6
(905) 934-3838
Business Address: Haldimand War Memorial Hospital
206 John Street
Dunnville Ontario N1A 2P7
(905) 774-7431

Corporation Name: J. Vilk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Nov 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Haldimand War Memorial Hospital
400 Broad Street W
Dunnville Ontario N1A 2P7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 774-7431
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville
HOSPITAL: Haldimand War Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Dunnville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffery Vilk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Aug 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Vilk (CPSO#: 74515 )
Business Address: Barclay Diagnostic Imaging
589 Lake Street
St Catharines Ontario L2N 7L6
(905) 934-3838
Business Address: Haldimand War Memorial Hospital
206 John Street
Dunnville Ontario N1A 2P7
(905) 774-7431

Corporation Name: J. Vilk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Nov 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFERY KIRK VILK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VILK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFERY KIRK VILK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VILK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2000
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Feb 2000