THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:06:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 462 Paxton St
Port Perry ON L9L 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9059855572
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 30 Sep 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site
LOCATION: Port Perry

HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ravi Tahiliani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Tahiliani (CPSO#: 74545 )
Business Address: 104A - 300 King Street West
Oshawa Ontario L1J 2K1
(905) 245-0616
Business Address: 462 Paxton St
Port Perry ON L9L 1L9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 462 Paxton St
Port Perry ON L9L 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9059855572
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 30 Sep 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site
LOCATION: Port Perry

HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ravi Tahiliani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Tahiliani (CPSO#: 74545 )
Business Address: 104A - 300 King Street West
Oshawa Ontario L1J 2K1
(905) 245-0616
Business Address: 462 Paxton St
Port Perry ON L9L 1L9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAVI TAHILIANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAHILIANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAVI TAHILIANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAHILIANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 02 Apr 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 2002

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 02 Apr 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Mar 2000