THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 11:34:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 45 River St
PO Box is 305
Coldwater ON L0K 1E0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-686-3335
Fax: 705-686-3837
Address: 32 Mill St
Aurora Ontario L4G2R9
Phone: 9057271939
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Roberta Place Nursing Home
503 Essa Road
Barrie Ontario L4N 9E4
Phone: (705) 733-3231
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2656 Line 6
Bradford ON L3Z 2A1
Phone: 9059522270
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Howard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 May 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Howard (CPSO#: 74552 )
Business Address: 503 Essa Road
Barrie Ontario L4N 9E4
(705) 733-3231
Business Address: 32 Mill Street
Aurora Ontario L4G 2R9
(905) 727-1939
Business Address: 200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston Ontario L9R 1W7
(705) 435-6281
Business Address: The Simcoe Clinic
Unit 2
279 Yonge Street
Barrie Ontario L4N 7T9
(705) 728-8860
Business Address: 143 Mary Street
Creemore Ontario L0M 1G0
(705) 446-3437
Business Address: 160 High Street
Sutton Ontario L0E 1R0
Business Address: Huronia Urgent Care Center
480 Huronia Road
Barrie Ontario L4N 6M2
(705) 792-0933

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 45 River St
PO Box is 305
Coldwater ON L0K 1E0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-686-3335
Fax: 705-686-3837
Address: 32 Mill St
Aurora Ontario L4G2R9
Phone: 9057271939
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Roberta Place Nursing Home
503 Essa Road
Barrie Ontario L4N 9E4
Phone: (705) 733-3231
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2656 Line 6
Bradford ON L3Z 2A1
Phone: 9059522270
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Howard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 May 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Howard (CPSO#: 74552 )
Business Address: 503 Essa Road
Barrie Ontario L4N 9E4
(705) 733-3231
Business Address: 32 Mill Street
Aurora Ontario L4G 2R9
(905) 727-1939
Business Address: 200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston Ontario L9R 1W7
(705) 435-6281
Business Address: The Simcoe Clinic
Unit 2
279 Yonge Street
Barrie Ontario L4N 7T9
(705) 728-8860
Business Address: 143 Mary Street
Creemore Ontario L0M 1G0
(705) 446-3437
Business Address: 160 High Street
Sutton Ontario L0E 1R0
Business Address: Huronia Urgent Care Center
480 Huronia Road
Barrie Ontario L4N 6M2
(705) 792-0933

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DOUGLAS JAMES HOWARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOWARD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DOUGLAS JAMES HOWARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOWARD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2000
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Mar 2000