THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:32:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AKAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Etobicoke Urgent Care Clinic
Unit 10
25 Woodbine Downs Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9W 6N5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 741-2273
Fax: (416) 741-3542
Address: 10088 MCLAUGLIN ROAD, UNIT 14
Brampton Ontario L7A 2X6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 747-3530
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Dec 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Atiemo Kessie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kessie (CPSO#: 74600 )
Business Address: 1500 Dixie Street East
Mississauga Ontario L4X 1L4
(905) 212-4733
Business Address: Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
(416) 494-2120
Business Address: Suite 2
4000 Highway 7
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 8Z2
(905) 851-3777
Business Address: Suite 8
51 Mountainiash Road
Brampton Ontario L6R 1W4
(905) 799-2722
Business Address: Suite 111
3530 Derry Road East
Mississauga Ontario L4T 4E3
(905) 672-2273
Business Address: 10088 McLaughlin Road
Brampton Ontario L7A 2X6
(905) 799-2971

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AKAN
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Etobicoke Urgent Care Clinic
Unit 10
25 Woodbine Downs Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9W 6N5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 741-2273
Fax: (416) 741-3542
Address: 10088 MCLAUGLIN ROAD, UNIT 14
Brampton Ontario L7A 2X6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 747-3530
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Dec 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Atiemo Kessie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kessie (CPSO#: 74600 )
Business Address: 1500 Dixie Street East
Mississauga Ontario L4X 1L4
(905) 212-4733
Business Address: Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
(416) 494-2120
Business Address: Suite 2
4000 Highway 7
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 8Z2
(905) 851-3777
Business Address: Suite 8
51 Mountainiash Road
Brampton Ontario L6R 1W4
(905) 799-2722
Business Address: Suite 111
3530 Derry Road East
Mississauga Ontario L4T 4E3
(905) 672-2273
Business Address: 10088 McLaughlin Road
Brampton Ontario L7A 2X6
(905) 799-2971

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ATIEMO KESSIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KESSIE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ATIEMO KESSIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KESSIE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2000
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Apr 2000