THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:56:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Transkei, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Basement B05
FMTU
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164318224
Fax: 4164398625

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Dec 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.D. Nicholas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Nicholas (CPSO#: 74614 )
Business Address: 3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Basement B05
FMTU
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5
4164318224

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Transkei, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Basement B05
FMTU
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164318224
Fax: 4164398625

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Dec 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.D. Nicholas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Nicholas (CPSO#: 74614 )
Business Address: 3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Basement B05
FMTU
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5
4164318224

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEETHA DEVAYOGINI NICHOLAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NICHOLAS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEETHA DEVAYOGINI NICHOLAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NICHOLAS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Transkei, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2000
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Apr 2000