THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
28/05/25 02:13:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
North York Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Scarborough General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jordan Carr Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Aug 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Carr (CPSO#: 74621 )
Business Address: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
North York Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6000
Business Address: Scarborough General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T7
(416) 431-8165

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
North York Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Scarborough General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jordan Carr Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Aug 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Carr (CPSO#: 74621 )
Business Address: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
North York Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6000
Business Address: Scarborough General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T7
(416) 431-8165

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JORDAN PAUL CARR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JORDAN PAUL CARR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 27 May 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 May 2000
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 27 May 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 May 2000