THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 11:08:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-883-1212
Extension: 2064
Fax: (905) 883-2065
Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
Phone: 905-883-1212
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 10 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Penny Turner & Dr. Anthony Woods Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jul 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Woods (CPSO#: 80000 ) Dr. P. Turner (CPSO#: 74668 )
Business Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Vaughan Ontario L6A 5A9
Business Address: Durham Regional Cancer Centre
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711 Extn: 2827
Business Address: 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 743-2121
Business Address: Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-1212

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-883-1212
Extension: 2064
Fax: (905) 883-2065
Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
Phone: 905-883-1212
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 10 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Penny Turner & Dr. Anthony Woods Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jul 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Woods (CPSO#: 80000 ) Dr. P. Turner (CPSO#: 74668 )
Business Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Vaughan Ontario L6A 5A9
Business Address: Durham Regional Cancer Centre
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711 Extn: 2827
Business Address: 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 743-2121
Business Address: Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-1212

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PENNY ANN TURNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TURNER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PENNY ANN TURNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TURNER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 07 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2000
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Apr 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 07 Jun 2005

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jun 2000