THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:39:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 204
119 Memorial Avenue
Orillia Ontario L3V 5X1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 323-9800
Fax: (705) 323-9601

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bradley E. Perrigo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Aug 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Perrigo (CPSO#: 74673 )
Business Address: 204 - 119 Memorial Avenue
Orillia Ontario L3V 5X1
(705) 323-9800

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 204
119 Memorial Avenue
Orillia Ontario L3V 5X1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 323-9800
Fax: (705) 323-9601

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bradley E. Perrigo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Aug 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Perrigo (CPSO#: 74673 )
Business Address: 204 - 119 Memorial Avenue
Orillia Ontario L3V 5X1
(705) 323-9800

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRADLEY EDMUND PERRIGO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERRIGO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRADLEY EDMUND PERRIGO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERRIGO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000