THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:07:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: Pearen-Parachin, Deborah Cynthia (Used Until: 04 Jun 2002)
Medical School: McMaster University, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1225 King Road
Burlington Ontario L7T 0B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-681-4415
Fax: 416-981-8737
Address: 800 Kipling Ave
Unit 2
Etobicoke ON M8Z 5G5
Phone: 416-207-6000
Extension: 6321
Fax: 416-207-5165
Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Phone: 905-338-4618
Fax: 905-338-4146

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Deborah Parachin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Parachin (CPSO#: 74675 )
Business Address: 1225 King Road
Burlington Ontario L7R 3X5

General Information

Former Name: Pearen-Parachin, Deborah Cynthia (Used Until: 04 Jun 2002)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1225 King Road
Burlington Ontario L7T 0B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-681-4415
Fax: 416-981-8737
Address: 800 Kipling Ave
Unit 2
Etobicoke ON M8Z 5G5
Phone: 416-207-6000
Extension: 6321
Fax: 416-207-5165
Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Phone: 905-338-4618
Fax: 905-338-4146

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Deborah Parachin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Parachin (CPSO#: 74675 )
Business Address: 1225 King Road
Burlington Ontario L7R 3X5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEBORAH CYNTHIA PARACHIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARACHIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEBORAH CYNTHIA PARACHIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARACHIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000