THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 04:50:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 51 K Highway 105
PO Box 311
Red Lake Ontario P0V 2M0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 727-2617
Fax: (866) 665-1639

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Sep 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 18 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients who saw Dr Habermehl at the Woodlands Medical Associates clinic in Kenora, ON should request a copy of their medical record at the address above.
The Sunset Country Family Health Team
1 - 35 Wolsley St
Kenora, ON P9N 0H8
Phone: 807-468-6321
Fax: 807-468-3978
Date Received: 15 Jun 2018

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital Red Lake
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
HOSPITAL: Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Red Lake

HOSPITAL: Dryden Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Dryden

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lisa Marie Habermehl Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Habermehl (CPSO#: 74697 )
Business Address: 51 K Highway 105
Red Lake Ontario P0V 2M0
(807) 727-3378

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 51 K Highway 105
PO Box 311
Red Lake Ontario P0V 2M0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 727-2617
Fax: (866) 665-1639

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Sep 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 18 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients who saw Dr Habermehl at the Woodlands Medical Associates clinic in Kenora, ON should request a copy of their medical record at the address above.
The Sunset Country Family Health Team
1 - 35 Wolsley St
Kenora, ON P9N 0H8
Phone: 807-468-6321
Fax: 807-468-3978
Date Received: 15 Jun 2018

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital Red Lake
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
HOSPITAL: Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Red Lake

HOSPITAL: Dryden Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Dryden

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lisa Marie Habermehl Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Habermehl (CPSO#: 74697 )
Business Address: 51 K Highway 105
Red Lake Ontario P0V 2M0
(807) 727-3378

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LISA MARIE HABERMEHL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HABERMEHL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LISA MARIE HABERMEHL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HABERMEHL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000