THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:23:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, JAMAICAN CREOLE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2202 Thurston Dr
Human 2.0
Ottawa Ontario K1G 6E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-730-5483
Fax: 613-482-1406
Address: 328 Second Street West
Cornwall Ontario K6J 1G9
Phone: (613) 703-1962
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 840 McConnell Ave
Cornwall, ON
Cornwall Ontario K6H 5S5
Phone: (613) 938-4240
Fax: (613) 482-1406

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 29 May 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher Raynor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Aug 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Raynor (CPSO#: 74705 )
Business Address: 2202 Thurston Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1G 6E1
(613) 730-5483
Business Address: 840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall Ontario K6H 5S5
(613) 938-4246

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, JAMAICAN CREOLE
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2202 Thurston Dr
Human 2.0
Ottawa Ontario K1G 6E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-730-5483
Fax: 613-482-1406
Address: 328 Second Street West
Cornwall Ontario K6J 1G9
Phone: (613) 703-1962
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 840 McConnell Ave
Cornwall, ON
Cornwall Ontario K6H 5S5
Phone: (613) 938-4240
Fax: (613) 482-1406

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 29 May 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher Raynor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Aug 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Raynor (CPSO#: 74705 )
Business Address: 2202 Thurston Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1G 6E1
(613) 730-5483
Business Address: 840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall Ontario K6H 5S5
(613) 938-4246

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER FITZGERALD RAYNOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAYNOR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER FITZGERALD RAYNOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAYNOR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Dec 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000