THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:12:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3050 Argentia Rd
Mississauga ON L5N 8E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057853627
Fax: 9057853628
Address: 6-2980 Crosscurrent Dr
Mississauga ON L5N 7C7
Phone: 9052885900
Fax: 9057853628

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Goyal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jul 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Goyal (CPSO#: 74711 )
Business Address: West Mississauga Medical
3050 Argentia Road
Mississauga Ontario L5N 8E1
(905) 785-3627

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3050 Argentia Rd
Mississauga ON L5N 8E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057853627
Fax: 9057853628
Address: 6-2980 Crosscurrent Dr
Mississauga ON L5N 7C7
Phone: 9052885900
Fax: 9057853628

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Goyal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jul 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Goyal (CPSO#: 74711 )
Business Address: West Mississauga Medical
3050 Argentia Road
Mississauga Ontario L5N 8E1
(905) 785-3627

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SOHAL VINIT GOYAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOYAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SOHAL VINIT GOYAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOYAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000