THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:59:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Family Health Team
377 Church Street
Suite 101
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 471-9999
Fax: (905) 471-3627
Address: Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham, Ontario
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Phone: 905-472-7058
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Long-Term Care
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room KGE31
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Extension: 4830
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 31 Aug 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 31 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Allan K. Grill Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Grill (CPSO#: 74728 )
Business Address: 381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
(905) 472-7058
Business Address: Markham Family Physicians
101 - 377 Church Street
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
(905) 471-9999
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room KGE 31
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Family Health Team
377 Church Street
Suite 101
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 471-9999
Fax: (905) 471-3627
Address: Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham, Ontario
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Phone: 905-472-7058
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Long-Term Care
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room KGE31
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Extension: 4830
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 31 Aug 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 31 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Allan K. Grill Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Grill (CPSO#: 74728 )
Business Address: 381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
(905) 472-7058
Business Address: Markham Family Physicians
101 - 377 Church Street
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
(905) 471-9999
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room KGE 31
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALLAN KEVIN GRILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRILL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALLAN KEVIN GRILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRILL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 03 Feb 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Apr 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 03 Feb 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000