THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:38:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 208
531 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 6P5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 953-8838
Extension: 1
Fax: (905) 953-8521

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shea Chia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chia (CPSO#: 74729 )
Business Address: Suite 208
531 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 6P5
(905) 953-8838

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 208
531 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 6P5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 953-8838
Extension: 1
Fax: (905) 953-8521

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shea Chia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chia (CPSO#: 74729 )
Business Address: Suite 208
531 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 6P5
(905) 953-8838

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHEA TZI CHIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHEA TZI CHIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jul 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000