THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:07:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2401 Yonge Street, Suite 202
Toronto Ontario M4P 3H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-322-3700
Fax: 416-322-3707

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Aug 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 15 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. VALERIE HA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Ha (CPSO#: 74738 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2401 Yonge Street, Suite 202
Toronto Ontario M4P 3H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-322-3700
Fax: 416-322-3707

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Aug 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 15 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. VALERIE HA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Ha (CPSO#: 74738 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VALERIE HA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VALERIE HA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Aug 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000