THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:04:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 401 Bay Street
Suite 1600
Toronto Ontario M5H 2Y4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 938 1278
Fax: 647 277 9010

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. SHERESE ALI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ali (CPSO#: 74742 )
Business Address: 439 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1Y8
4169381278
Business Address: 1600-401 Bay St
Toronto ON M5H 2Y4

Corporation Name: Dr. Sherese Ali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Aug 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 401 Bay Street
Suite 1600
Toronto Ontario M5H 2Y4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 938 1278
Fax: 647 277 9010

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. SHERESE ALI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ali (CPSO#: 74742 )
Business Address: 439 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1Y8
4169381278
Business Address: 1600-401 Bay St
Toronto ON M5H 2Y4

Corporation Name: Dr. Sherese Ali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Aug 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHERESE ALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHERESE ALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Apr 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000