THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:58:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Georgetown Medical Associates
199 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown Ontario L7G 0E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 873-3000
Fax: (905) 873-0800

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yasar Razvi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Aug 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Razvi (CPSO#: 74759 )
Business Address: 1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown Ontario L7G 2Z8
(905) 873-0111
Business Address: 199 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown Ontario L7G 0E3
(905) 873-3000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Georgetown Medical Associates
199 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown Ontario L7G 0E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 873-3000
Fax: (905) 873-0800

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yasar Razvi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Aug 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Razvi (CPSO#: 74759 )
Business Address: 1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown Ontario L7G 2Z8
(905) 873-0111
Business Address: 199 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown Ontario L7G 0E3
(905) 873-3000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YASAR SYED RAZVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAZVI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YASAR SYED RAZVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAZVI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Oct 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000