THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 04:35:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 955 Oliver Rd
NOSM University
Phase 1, Introduction to Clinical Medicine
955 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON P7B 5E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 8076302342
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anne Robinson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Robinson (CPSO#: 74760 )
Business Address: Northern Clinic
4 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1K2
(807) 737-5160
Business Address: 955 Oliver Rd
NOSM University
Phase 1, Introduction to Clinical Skills
Thunder Bay ON P7B 5E1
807-630-2342

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 955 Oliver Rd
NOSM University
Phase 1, Introduction to Clinical Medicine
955 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON P7B 5E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 8076302342
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anne Robinson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Robinson (CPSO#: 74760 )
Business Address: Northern Clinic
4 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1K2
(807) 737-5160
Business Address: 955 Oliver Rd
NOSM University
Phase 1, Introduction to Clinical Skills
Thunder Bay ON P7B 5E1
807-630-2342

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNE MICHELLE ROBINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBINSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNE MICHELLE ROBINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBINSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000