THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 05:16:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 2N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056233331
Extension: 1311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3rd Floor, Bldg F
6500 Silver Dart Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5P1B4
Phone: 9056762400
Fax: 9056762011
Address: 5530 Miller Rd
Richmond BC V7B 1K4
Phone: 604-231-6951
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R A Lombardi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Feb 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Lombardi (CPSO#: 74795 )
Business Address: 47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 2N3
9056233331
Business Address: 6500 Silver Dart Drive
Building F, 3rd Floor
Mississauga Ontario L5P 1C3
9056762400

Corporation Name: R. A. Lombardi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Aug 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 2N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056233331
Extension: 1311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3rd Floor, Bldg F
6500 Silver Dart Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5P1B4
Phone: 9056762400
Fax: 9056762011
Address: 5530 Miller Rd
Richmond BC V7B 1K4
Phone: 604-231-6951
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R A Lombardi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Feb 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Lombardi (CPSO#: 74795 )
Business Address: 47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 2N3
9056233331
Business Address: 6500 Silver Dart Drive
Building F, 3rd Floor
Mississauga Ontario L5P 1C3
9056762400

Corporation Name: R. A. Lombardi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Aug 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROCCO ANTHONY LOMBARDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOMBARDI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROCCO ANTHONY LOMBARDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOMBARDI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000