THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 05:42:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC University Hospital
PO Box 5339 Room C7-119A
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3597
Fax: (519) 663-3609

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Shoesmith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Shoesmith (CPSO#: 74797 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences-University Hospital
P.O. Box 5339
Room C7-119A
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 663-3597

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC University Hospital
PO Box 5339 Room C7-119A
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3597
Fax: (519) 663-3609

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Shoesmith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Shoesmith (CPSO#: 74797 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences-University Hospital
P.O. Box 5339
Room C7-119A
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 663-3597

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTEN LOUISE SHOESMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHOESMITH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTEN LOUISE SHOESMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHOESMITH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000