THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:09:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: Westergaard, Danna Adele (Used Until: 10 Sep 2020) Westergaard, Danna Adele (Used Until: 13 Dec 2000)
Medical School: Queen's University, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Divof Cardiology Electrophysiology
Room 4NU 492
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3535
Fax: (647) 693-7543

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 18 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 18 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. SPEARS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Spears (CPSO#: 74820 )

General Information

Former Name: Westergaard, Danna Adele (Used Until: 10 Sep 2020) Westergaard, Danna Adele (Used Until: 13 Dec 2000)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Divof Cardiology Electrophysiology
Room 4NU 492
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3535
Fax: (647) 693-7543

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 18 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 18 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. SPEARS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Spears (CPSO#: 74820 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANNA ADELE SPEARS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPEARS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANNA ADELE SPEARS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPEARS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000