THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:11:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: Sowery, Richard Douglas (Used Until: 12 Jul 2007)
Medical School: Queen's University, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Upper Canada Place
Unit 12
460 Brant Street
Burlington Ontario L7R 4B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 637-3900
Fax: (905) 637-5557

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Richard Sowery Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Nov 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sowery (CPSO#: 74821 )
Business Address: Upper Canada Place
Unit 12
460 Brant Street
Burlington Ontario L7R 4B6
(905) 637-3900

General Information

Former Name: Sowery, Richard Douglas (Used Until: 12 Jul 2007)
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Upper Canada Place
Unit 12
460 Brant Street
Burlington Ontario L7R 4B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 637-3900
Fax: (905) 637-5557

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Richard Sowery Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Nov 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sowery (CPSO#: 74821 )
Business Address: Upper Canada Place
Unit 12
460 Brant Street
Burlington Ontario L7R 4B6
(905) 637-3900

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICHARD STANLEY DOUGLAS SOWERY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOWERY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICHARD STANLEY DOUGLAS SOWERY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOWERY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jul 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000