THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:29:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Khartoum, 1981
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 302
3024 Hurontario Street
Mississauga Ontario L5B 4M4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 272-6776
Fax: (905) 272-1566

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amal Hassan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hassan (CPSO#: 74827 )
Business Address: Suite 302
3024 Hurontario Street
Mississauga Ontario L5B 4M4
(905) 272-6776

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Khartoum, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 302
3024 Hurontario Street
Mississauga Ontario L5B 4M4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 272-6776
Fax: (905) 272-1566

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amal Hassan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hassan (CPSO#: 74827 )
Business Address: Suite 302
3024 Hurontario Street
Mississauga Ontario L5B 4M4
(905) 272-6776

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMAL ALI HASSAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASSAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMAL ALI HASSAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASSAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Khartoum, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000