THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:35:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 103
1515 Gordon Street
Guelph Ontario N1L 1C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 829-1414
Fax: (519) 829-2467
Address: Guelph General Hospital
Emergency Department
115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
Phone: (519) 822-5350
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adam Shecter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Feb 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shecter (CPSO#: 74835 )
Business Address: Suite 103
1515 Gordon Street
Guelph Ontario N1L 1C9
(519) 829-1414
Business Address: 115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
(519) 837-6420

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 103
1515 Gordon Street
Guelph Ontario N1L 1C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 829-1414
Fax: (519) 829-2467
Address: Guelph General Hospital
Emergency Department
115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
Phone: (519) 822-5350
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adam Shecter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Feb 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shecter (CPSO#: 74835 )
Business Address: Suite 103
1515 Gordon Street
Guelph Ontario N1L 1C9
(519) 829-1414
Business Address: 115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
(519) 837-6420

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADAM CHRISTOPHER SHECTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHECTER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADAM CHRISTOPHER SHECTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHECTER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000